THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 06:05:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 474 College Street
unit 407
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 877-718-2196
Fax: 289-203-2025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SULAIMAN MEDCARE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alrashidi (CPSO#: 105695 )
Business Address: 948 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1M8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 474 College Street
unit 407
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 877-718-2196
Fax: 289-203-2025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SULAIMAN MEDCARE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alrashidi (CPSO#: 105695 )
Business Address: 948 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1M8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULAIMAN H H H A ALRASHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRASHIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULAIMAN H H H A ALRASHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRASHIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2015