THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281 7465

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lim (CPSO#: 105696 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281 7465

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lim (CPSO#: 105696 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Teresa Lim may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and
adolescent psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Teresa Lim may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and
adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2015