THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:36:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System Welland Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
63 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 44224
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5803 Main St
clinic
urgent care
first floor
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5Z6
Phone: 2892480160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jascinth James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. James (CPSO#: 105704 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System Welland Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
63 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 44224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System Welland Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
63 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 44224
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5803 Main St
clinic
urgent care
first floor
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5Z6
Phone: 2892480160
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jascinth James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. James (CPSO#: 105704 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System Welland Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
63 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 44224

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jascinth Genevieve James may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jascinth Genevieve James may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2015