THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 81 Middlecote Drive
Unit A7
Ajax Ontario L1T 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052391182
Fax: 2897332039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Albadry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Albadry (CPSO#: 105719 )
Business Address: 81 Middlecote Drive
Suite A7
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K3
(905) 239-1182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 81 Middlecote Drive
Unit A7
Ajax Ontario L1T 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052391182
Fax: 2897332039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Albadry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Albadry (CPSO#: 105719 )
Business Address: 81 Middlecote Drive
Suite A7
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K3
(905) 239-1182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MUTHENNA MAJEED ALBADRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBADRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MUTHENNA MAJEED ALBADRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBADRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015