THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 566 Louise St.
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-2420
Extension: 6318
Fax: 613-774-7206
Address: 2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: 613-258-4997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rimon Ghattas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghattas (CPSO#: 105720 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
6137742420 Extn: 6318

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 566 Louise St.
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-2420
Extension: 6318
Fax: 613-774-7206
Address: 2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: 613-258-4997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rimon Ghattas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghattas (CPSO#: 105720 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
6137742420 Extn: 6318

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIMON GHATTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATTAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIMON GHATTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATTAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2015