THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:19:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St. Joseph's Health Care London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's Health Care London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARC LAURENT CHRETIEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chretien (CPSO#: 105744 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St. Joseph's Health Care London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's Health Care London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARC LAURENT CHRETIEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chretien (CPSO#: 105744 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC LAURENT CHRETIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRETIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC LAURENT CHRETIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRETIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2015