THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:44:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave St
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 Bertie St
Fort Erie ON L2A 1Z2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third St
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jung-Pin Yeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeh (CPSO#: 105757 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
905-378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave St
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 Bertie St
Fort Erie ON L2A 1Z2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third St
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jung-Pin Yeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeh (CPSO#: 105757 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
905-378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUNG-PIN YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUNG-PIN YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015