THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Anesthesia
First floor/ Operating Room (OR)
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19056832320
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Sunset Dr
Chaleur Regional Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Floor 1, OR
Bathurst NB E2A 4L7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for mental Health
Anesthesia
First floor/ ECT room
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Phone: 9054304055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 19 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ABDELGHANY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdelghany (CPSO#: 105776 )
Business Address: 148 McKee Avenue
North York
Toronto Ontario M2N 4C4
6476865560

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Anesthesia
First floor/ Operating Room (OR)
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19056832320
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Sunset Dr
Chaleur Regional Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Floor 1, OR
Bathurst NB E2A 4L7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for mental Health
Anesthesia
First floor/ ECT room
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Phone: 9054304055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 19 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ABDELGHANY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdelghany (CPSO#: 105776 )
Business Address: 148 McKee Avenue
North York
Toronto Ontario M2N 4C4
6476865560

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEH MOHAMMED OSMAN ABDELGHANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGHANY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEH MOHAMMED OSMAN ABDELGHANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGHANY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015