THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:12:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Goa University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BHAVANA NAUTIYAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nautiyal (CPSO#: 105784 )
Business Address: 6-715 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
5196212424
Business Address: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Goa University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BHAVANA NAUTIYAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nautiyal (CPSO#: 105784 )
Business Address: 6-715 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
5196212424
Business Address: 201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHAVANA NAUTIYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAUTIYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHAVANA NAUTIYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAUTIYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Goa University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015