THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 264 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-309-4646
Fax: 905-309-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Sato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sato (CPSO#: 105798 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 264 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 264 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-309-4646
Fax: 905-309-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Sato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sato (CPSO#: 105798 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: 264 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN KEIICHI SATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN KEIICHI SATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015