THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:26:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Suite 206
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
4th Floor
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Centre for Headache
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6136
Fax: 416-323-6007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CANDICE M. TODD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Todd (CPSO#: 105808 )
Business Address: 206-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
416-289-0185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Suite 206
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
4th Floor
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Centre for Headache
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6136
Fax: 416-323-6007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CANDICE M. TODD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Todd (CPSO#: 105808 )
Business Address: 206-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
416-289-0185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CANDICE MARIE TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CANDICE MARIE TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015