THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:45:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nima Sadoughi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadoughi (CPSO#: 105809 )
Business Address: 155 University Ave
Unit 300
Toronto ON M5H 3B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nima Sadoughi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadoughi (CPSO#: 105809 )
Business Address: 155 University Ave
Unit 300
Toronto ON M5H 3B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIMA SADOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADOUGHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIMA SADOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADOUGHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015