THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-8600
Fax: 905-488-5454
Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9080 Yonge St
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 2895977676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10594 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C8
Phone: 9057371010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdi (CPSO#: 105813 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
(519) 352-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-8600
Fax: 905-488-5454
Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9080 Yonge St
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 2895977676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10594 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C8
Phone: 9057371010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdi (CPSO#: 105813 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
(519) 352-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMIDREZA ABDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMIDREZA ABDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015