THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anum Tabish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tabish (CPSO#: 105818 )
Business Address: 104-100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Address: 170 Rebecca Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 1J6
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anum Tabish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tabish (CPSO#: 105818 )
Business Address: 104-100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Business Address: 170 Rebecca Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 1J6
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUM TABISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUM TABISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015