THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:03:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Burr 2
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 7602
Fax: 613-548-2500
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.J. Merchant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merchant (CPSO#: 105842 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6651

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Burr 2
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 7602
Fax: 613-548-2500
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.J. Merchant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merchant (CPSO#: 105842 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6651

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILA JAMALUDDIN MERCHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILA JAMALUDDIN MERCHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2015