THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:03:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Unit G1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jemy Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joseph (CPSO#: 105854 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Unit G1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jemy Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joseph (CPSO#: 105854 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEMY MARY JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEMY MARY JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015