THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:08:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Guelph St
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-877-4123
Fax: 905-873-8882
Address: 175 Forum Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4E5
Phone: (905) 501-1443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 386 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5B 0A5
Phone: 437-886-5915
Fax: 416-352-0110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pellini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pellini (CPSO#: 105858 )
Business Address: 171 Guelph Street
2nd Floor
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
(905) 877-4123

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Guelph St
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-877-4123
Fax: 905-873-8882
Address: 175 Forum Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4E5
Phone: (905) 501-1443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 386 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5B 0A5
Phone: 437-886-5915
Fax: 416-352-0110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pellini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pellini (CPSO#: 105858 )
Business Address: 171 Guelph Street
2nd Floor
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
(905) 877-4123

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARK PELLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARK PELLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015