THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 01:21:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room EM-206, Box 227
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Prudhomme Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prudhomme (CPSO#: 105870 ) Dr. A. Pellerin (CPSO#: 106241 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621 Extn: 4212
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room EM-206, Box 227
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Ext. 19002

Corporation Name: Annabelle Pellerin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prudhomme (CPSO#: 105870 ) Dr. A. Pellerin (CPSO#: 106241 )
Business Address: PO Box 305
179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet ON K0B 1L0
613-673-4318

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room EM-206, Box 227
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Prudhomme Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prudhomme (CPSO#: 105870 ) Dr. A. Pellerin (CPSO#: 106241 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-746-4621 Extn: 4212
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room EM-206, Box 227
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Ext. 19002

Corporation Name: Annabelle Pellerin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prudhomme (CPSO#: 105870 ) Dr. A. Pellerin (CPSO#: 106241 )
Business Address: PO Box 305
179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet ON K0B 1L0
613-673-4318

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS MICHAEL PRUDHOMME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUDHOMME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS MICHAEL PRUDHOMME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUDHOMME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015