THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:48:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave- Suite 206
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Sinai Health System Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Brienza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Brienza (CPSO#: 105879 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
206-600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165864800
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: 4 - 160 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6W 2E1
(905) 450-2700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave- Suite 206
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Sinai Health System Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Brienza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Brienza (CPSO#: 105879 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
206-600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165864800
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: 4 - 160 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6W 2E1
(905) 450-2700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT JOSEPH MICHAEL BRIENZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIENZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT JOSEPH MICHAEL BRIENZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIENZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015