THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 05:24:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 675 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-768-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-150 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1151 Bronte Road
Office of the Commissioner &
Medical Officer of Health
Oakville Ontario L6M 3L1
Phone: 905-825-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick C. Galange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galange (CPSO#: 105889 )
Business Address: 159 Panin Road
Burlington Ontario L7P 5A6
(905) 680-6441
Business Address: 675 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z5
(905) 768-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 675 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-768-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-150 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1151 Bronte Road
Office of the Commissioner &
Medical Officer of Health
Oakville Ontario L6M 3L1
Phone: 905-825-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick C. Galange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galange (CPSO#: 105889 )
Business Address: 159 Panin Road
Burlington Ontario L7P 5A6
(905) 680-6441
Business Address: 675 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z5
(905) 768-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CHRISTOPHER GALANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALANGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK CHRISTOPHER GALANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALANGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015