THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring St
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy B. Toderian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toderian (CPSO#: 105896 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
6132569370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring St
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy B. Toderian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toderian (CPSO#: 105896 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
6132569370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY BEVERLEY TODERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODERIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY BEVERLEY TODERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODERIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015