THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:08:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.621.9257
Fax: 519.208.8182
Address: Parkwood Institute Main Building
Palliative Care Unit
550 Wellington Rd.
London Ontario N6C 5J1
Phone: 519 646 6100
Extension: 42511
Fax: 519 685 4589
Address: InMedic Pain Management Centres
685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Z 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Address: Palliative Care Outreach Team # 2
South West LHIN Head Office
356 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1T3
Phone: 1 800-811-5146
Fax: 519 601 2379

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Achtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Achtar (CPSO#: 105910 )
Business Address: Pallative Care Outreach Team
South West LHIN Head Office
356 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1T3
(800) 811-5146
Business Address: Parkwood Institute
Main Building and Mental Health
550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 5J1
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 48155
Business Address: InMedic Pain Management Centres
685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Z 2L4
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621
Business Address: 110-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
(519) 621-9257

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.621.9257
Fax: 519.208.8182
Address: Parkwood Institute Main Building
Palliative Care Unit
550 Wellington Rd.
London Ontario N6C 5J1
Phone: 519 646 6100
Extension: 42511
Fax: 519 685 4589
Address: InMedic Pain Management Centres
685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Z 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Address: Palliative Care Outreach Team # 2
South West LHIN Head Office
356 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1T3
Phone: 1 800-811-5146
Fax: 519 601 2379

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Achtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Achtar (CPSO#: 105910 )
Business Address: Pallative Care Outreach Team
South West LHIN Head Office
356 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1T3
(800) 811-5146
Business Address: Parkwood Institute
Main Building and Mental Health
550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 5J1
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 48155
Business Address: InMedic Pain Management Centres
685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Z 2L4
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621
Business Address: 110-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
(519) 621-9257

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARAA ACHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHTAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARAA ACHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHTAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015