THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:57:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Centre
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Johansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Johansen (CPSO#: 105916 )
Business Address: Andrew Street Family Health Centre
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: 409-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
5198049300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
Westside Family Health Centre
Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Johansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Johansen (CPSO#: 105916 )
Business Address: Andrew Street Family Health Centre
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: 409-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
5198049300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHANSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHANSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015