THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive, Suite 262
North York Ontario M2J2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-698-8788
Fax: 416-698-0188
Address: Maple - NA-House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofia Nastis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nastis (CPSO#: 105919 )
Business Address: 501 - 294 Main Street
Toronto Ontario M4C 4X5
(416) 698-8788
Business Address: 262-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
416-698-8788

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive, Suite 262
North York Ontario M2J2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-698-8788
Fax: 416-698-0188
Address: Maple - NA-House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofia Nastis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nastis (CPSO#: 105919 )
Business Address: 501 - 294 Main Street
Toronto Ontario M4C 4X5
(416) 698-8788
Business Address: 262-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
416-698-8788

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA NASTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA NASTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015