THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:51:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: S100 - 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2G 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chow & N. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chow (CPSO#: 105921 ) Dr. N. Sangha (CPSO#: 100620 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A4
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 22 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7M3
(905) 984-3335
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L2B 4W5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: S100 - 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2G 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chow & N. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chow (CPSO#: 105921 ) Dr. N. Sangha (CPSO#: 100620 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A4
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 22 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7M3
(905) 984-3335
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L2B 4W5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015