THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:09:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Brown, Rachel Christine (Used Until: 01 Oct 2015)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-645 Finkle St
Woodstock ON N4V 0E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-537-8303
Fax: 519-539-3838

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: Brown, Rachel Christine (Used Until: 01 Oct 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-645 Finkle St
Woodstock ON N4V 0E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-537-8303
Fax: 519-539-3838

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CHRISTINE ORCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORCHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL CHRISTINE ORCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORCHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015