THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Community Clinic
1201 Queen St
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-2823
Fax: 8776868633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Cavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cavanagh (CPSO#: 105929 )
Business Address: 1201 Queen St
Kincardine ON N2Z 3C1
5193962823

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Cavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Community Clinic
1201 Queen St
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-2823
Fax: 8776868633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Cavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cavanagh (CPSO#: 105929 )
Business Address: 1201 Queen St
Kincardine ON N2Z 3C1
5193962823

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Cavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA DAWN CAVANAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAVANAGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA DAWN CAVANAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAVANAGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015