THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:36:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Wonnacott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wonnacott (CPSO#: 105935 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Wonnacott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wonnacott (CPSO#: 105935 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR JOSEPH WONNACOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONNACOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR JOSEPH WONNACOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONNACOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015