THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-354-5540
Fax: 519-354-6120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Sikkema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sikkema (CPSO#: 105939 )
Business Address: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
(519) 354-5540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-354-5540
Fax: 519-354-6120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Sikkema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sikkema (CPSO#: 105939 )
Business Address: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
(519) 354-5540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ROCHELLE SIKKEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKKEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ROCHELLE SIKKEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKKEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015