THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Hematology-Oncology
Rm 2-084, Donnelly Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5734
Fax: 416-864-3055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.S. Rupani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rupani (CPSO#: 105960 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
2-084 DONNELLY WING
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-5389

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Hematology-Oncology
Rm 2-084, Donnelly Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5734
Fax: 416-864-3055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.S. Rupani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rupani (CPSO#: 105960 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
2-084 DONNELLY WING
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-5389

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA SHELIZA RUPANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA SHELIZA RUPANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015