THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:10:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Suite 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: 519-822-8240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. STEPHANIE HERMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herman (CPSO#: 105980 )
Business Address: 1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
519-837-8137
Business Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Parkview Family Practice
Unit 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
(519) 837-8137

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Suite 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: 519-822-8240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. STEPHANIE HERMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herman (CPSO#: 105980 )
Business Address: 1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
519-837-8137
Business Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Parkview Family Practice
Unit 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
(519) 837-8137

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JANE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JANE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015