THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:36:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Finner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finner (CPSO#: 105995 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Finner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finner (CPSO#: 105995 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK FINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK FINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015