THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
and Children's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Clemente Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clemente (CPSO#: 106025 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
and Children's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Emergency Department
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Clemente Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clemente (CPSO#: 106025 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID CLEMENTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID CLEMENTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015