THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:31:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: First Medical Group Orillia
115-210 Memorial Ave Orillia
Orillia, Ontario
L3V 7V1
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 329-1223
Fax: (844)321-8485
Address: Hugh Allen Clinic Family Physicians
79 5th Avenue N
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout, Ontario P8T 1A8
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather D Laakso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Laakso (CPSO#: 106039 )
Business Address: First Medical Group Orillia
115 - 210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 7V1
(705) 329-1223
Business Address: P.O. Box 489
79 5th Avenue North
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: First Medical Group Orillia
115-210 Memorial Ave Orillia
Orillia, Ontario
L3V 7V1
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 329-1223
Fax: (844)321-8485
Address: Hugh Allen Clinic Family Physicians
79 5th Avenue N
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout, Ontario P8T 1A8
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather D Laakso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Laakso (CPSO#: 106039 )
Business Address: First Medical Group Orillia
115 - 210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 7V1
(705) 329-1223
Business Address: P.O. Box 489
79 5th Avenue North
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER DAWN LAAKSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAAKSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER DAWN LAAKSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAAKSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015