THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Medicine
Suite D107, Box 209
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14473
Fax: (613) 761-4186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ISMAIL AND ZHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 106042 ) Dr. C. Zhou (CPSO#: 112227 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Suite D107
Box 209
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555 Extn: 14473
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
613-721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Medicine
Suite D107, Box 209
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 14473
Fax: (613) 761-4186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ISMAIL AND ZHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 106042 ) Dr. C. Zhou (CPSO#: 112227 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Suite D107
Box 209
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555 Extn: 14473
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
613-721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABID ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABID ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015