THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:00:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sigurdson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sigurdson (CPSO#: 106056 )
Business Address: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sigurdson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sigurdson (CPSO#: 106056 )
Business Address: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA SPALDING SIGURDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGURDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA SPALDING SIGURDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGURDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015