THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 10:06:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-450 Central Ave
London ON N6B 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 672 3020
Fax: 519-672-6090
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Mailbox B 57
Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arora (CPSO#: 106065 )
Business Address: 108-450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 672-3020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-450 Central Ave
London ON N6B 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 672 3020
Fax: 519-672-6090
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Mailbox B 57
Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arora (CPSO#: 106065 )
Business Address: 108-450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 672-3020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015