THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:06:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 470 Bronte Street South
Unit 110
Prime Care FHT
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058781720
Fax: 9058787857
Address: 150 Delhi Street
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: 519-964-4360
Fax: 800-903-5891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lizius Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lizius (CPSO#: 106066 )
Business Address: 217 Main St E
Milton ON L9T 1N9
9056934240 Extn: 4960

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 470 Bronte Street South
Unit 110
Prime Care FHT
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058781720
Fax: 9058787857
Address: 150 Delhi Street
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: 519-964-4360
Fax: 800-903-5891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lizius Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lizius (CPSO#: 106066 )
Business Address: 217 Main St E
Milton ON L9T 1N9
9056934240 Extn: 4960

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE LIZIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIZIUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE LIZIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIZIUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015