THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:33:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
Room 2L-411 Box 22
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8597
Fax: 416-260-3244
Address: 400-600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2333
Fax: 416-586-5067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
University Health Network Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Moores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moores (CPSO#: 106071 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray St
Room 2L-411 Box 22
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 8597
Fax: 416-260-3244
Address: 400-600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2333
Fax: 416-586-5067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
University Health Network Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G Moores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moores (CPSO#: 106071 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE LUANNE MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE LUANNE MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015