THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 631 Queenston Road
Suite 205
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-0155
Fax: 905-662-1022
Address: 201-112 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V2
Phone: 289-682-7282
Fax: 1-888-303-0286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Lone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lone (CPSO#: 106083 )
Business Address: 201-68 Centennial Pky S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Business Address: 631 Queenston Road
Suite 205
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
905-662-0155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 631 Queenston Road
Suite 205
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-662-0155
Fax: 905-662-1022
Address: 201-112 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V2
Phone: 289-682-7282
Fax: 1-888-303-0286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Lone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lone (CPSO#: 106083 )
Business Address: 201-68 Centennial Pky S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Business Address: 631 Queenston Road
Suite 205
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
905-662-0155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALAL AHMAD LONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALAL AHMAD LONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015