THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:15:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1223 Barton Street East
Pain Care Clinics
Hamilton Ontario L8H 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-768-7246
Fax: 289-779-2273
Address: 800 King St W
Second Floor
Unit B
Kitchener ON N2G 1E8
Phone: 226-895-7246
Fax: 226-895-2273
Address: 300 4th Ave, Unit D
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Phone: 365-653-7246
Fax: 365-653-7247

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Johnson (CPSO#: 106089 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: Unit D
300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(365) 653-7246
Business Address: Suite 2
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 0C2
(226) 440-2446

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1223 Barton Street East
Pain Care Clinics
Hamilton Ontario L8H 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-768-7246
Fax: 289-779-2273
Address: 800 King St W
Second Floor
Unit B
Kitchener ON N2G 1E8
Phone: 226-895-7246
Fax: 226-895-2273
Address: 300 4th Ave, Unit D
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Phone: 365-653-7246
Fax: 365-653-7247

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Johnson (CPSO#: 106089 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: Unit D
300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(365) 653-7246
Business Address: Suite 2
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 0C2
(226) 440-2446

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
04 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 04 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
Effective January 4, 2025, Dr. Johnson must cease to perform cervical facet joint injections until such time as he has a clinical supervisor approved by the College, as specified by section (6)(h) of his Undertaking with the College dated December 5, 2024.

(2 of 2)
As from December 5, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bradley Joel Johnson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. BRADLEY JOEL JOHNSON
(“Dr. Johnson”)

to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; “IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Johnson practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Johnson, certificate of registration number 106089, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-417672-W2Z7J4 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine practice, including my pain management practice.

(4) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated February 14, 2024 (“the February 2024 undertaking”) which restricted my practice. This Undertaking supersedes and replaces the February 2024 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”), for at least six (6) months (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval from the College.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Clinical Supervisor.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”;

(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months (“Moderate Level Supervision”);

(iv) During Moderate Level Supervision, directly observe at least ten (10) cervical facet joint injections performed by me;

(v) After a minimum of three (3) months of Moderate Level Supervision and direct observation of at least ten (10) cervical facet joint injections, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months (“Low Level Supervision”);

(vi) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(vii) Discuss any concerns arising from the direct observation and chart reviews;

(viii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(ix) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision;

(x) Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months during Moderate Level Supervision, or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision to Low Level Supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice; and

(xi) Remain free of any conflict of interest with me.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, as well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessors, dated November 30, 2023 and June 8, 2024, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(e) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(f) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to ensure that Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(g) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or (g) above, I will cease to perform cervical facet joint injections until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(i) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that if I am required to cease performing cervical facet joint injections as a result of section (6)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Out-of-Hospital Premises Standard: Image Guidance when administering nerve blocks for adult chronic pain, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;
2. Advice to the Profession: Image guidance when administering nerve blocks for adult chronic pain in Out-of-Hospital Premises, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;

(ii) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section

(7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Johnson’s practice of medicine, including his pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Johnson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least six months.

Dr. Johnson will engage in professional education in appropriate management of cervical facet joint injections, and in ensuring the appropriateness of the modality of imaging used for nerve blocks.

Dr. Johnson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
Effective January 4, 2025, Dr. Johnson must cease to perform cervical facet joint injections until such time as he has a clinical supervisor approved by the College, as specified by section (6)(h) of his Undertaking with the College dated December 5, 2024.

(2 of 2)
As from December 5, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bradley Joel Johnson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. BRADLEY JOEL JOHNSON
(“Dr. Johnson”)

to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; “IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Johnson practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Johnson, certificate of registration number 106089, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-417672-W2Z7J4 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine practice, including my pain management practice.

(4) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated February 14, 2024 (“the February 2024 undertaking”) which restricted my practice. This Undertaking supersedes and replaces the February 2024 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”), for at least six (6) months (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval from the College.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Clinical Supervisor.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”;

(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months (“Moderate Level Supervision”);

(iv) During Moderate Level Supervision, directly observe at least ten (10) cervical facet joint injections performed by me;

(v) After a minimum of three (3) months of Moderate Level Supervision and direct observation of at least ten (10) cervical facet joint injections, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months (“Low Level Supervision”);

(vi) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(vii) Discuss any concerns arising from the direct observation and chart reviews;

(viii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(ix) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision;

(x) Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months during Moderate Level Supervision, or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision to Low Level Supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice; and

(xi) Remain free of any conflict of interest with me.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, as well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessors, dated November 30, 2023 and June 8, 2024, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(e) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(f) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to ensure that Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(g) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or (g) above, I will cease to perform cervical facet joint injections until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(i) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that if I am required to cease performing cervical facet joint injections as a result of section (6)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Out-of-Hospital Premises Standard: Image Guidance when administering nerve blocks for adult chronic pain, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;
2. Advice to the Profession: Image guidance when administering nerve blocks for adult chronic pain in Out-of-Hospital Premises, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;

(ii) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section

(7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Johnson’s practice of medicine, including his pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Johnson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least six months.

Dr. Johnson will engage in professional education in appropriate management of cervical facet joint injections, and in ensuring the appropriateness of the modality of imaging used for nerve blocks.

Dr. Johnson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Johnson, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Johnson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 05 Dec 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bradley Joel Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 5, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Johnson’s practice of medicine, including his pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Johnson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least six months.

Dr. Johnson will engage in professional education in appropriate management of cervical facet joint injections, and in ensuring the appropriateness of the modality of imaging used for nerve blocks.

Dr. Johnson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 05 Dec 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bradley Joel Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 5, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Johnson’s practice of medicine, including his pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Johnson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least six months.

Dr. Johnson will engage in professional education in appropriate management of cervical facet joint injections, and in ensuring the appropriateness of the modality of imaging used for nerve blocks.

Dr. Johnson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Jan 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015