THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine B3
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 17886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adele Budiansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Budiansky (CPSO#: 106092 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B309
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 413-0636

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine B3
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Extension: 17886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adele Budiansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Budiansky (CPSO#: 106092 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B309
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 413-0636

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELE SANDRA BUDIANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDIANSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELE SANDRA BUDIANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDIANSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015