THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106A Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-901-5221
Fax: 905-702-2622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alaya Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yassein (CPSO#: 106106 )
Business Address: 106A Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 3Z5
9059015221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106A Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-901-5221
Fax: 905-702-2622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alaya Yassein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yassein (CPSO#: 106106 )
Business Address: 106A Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 3Z5
9059015221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAYA YASSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAYA YASSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015