THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 12:39:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B210-325 West St
Westside Obstetrics & Gynecology
Suite B210
Brantford ON N3R 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-730-0011
Fax: 226-730-0012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Smyth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smyth (CPSO#: 106111 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B210-325 West St
Westside Obstetrics & Gynecology
Suite B210
Brantford ON N3R 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-730-0011
Fax: 226-730-0012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Smyth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smyth (CPSO#: 106111 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHRYN SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHRYN SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015