THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-1142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JENNIFER JING WAH KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwan (CPSO#: 106117 )
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1142

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-1142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JENNIFER JING WAH KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwan (CPSO#: 106117 )
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1142

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JING WAH KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JING WAH KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015