THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:45:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. John's Medical College, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
Outpatient Programme
25 Front Ave W Brockville, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: 613-345-0640
Address: 243 Perth St
Brockville ON K6V 5E7
Phone: 613-341-2457
Extension: 5362
Fax: 613-342-2435
Address: 5-2200 Dundas St E
TELEMEDMD
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: +1 888-350-2323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMAP Health
Suite 110
1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa ON K2C 3N6
Phone: 1-888-691-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Nova Scotia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.S. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rao (CPSO#: 106121 )
Business Address: Health and Counselling Services
1125 University Drive #2600
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674
Business Address: Terrace Wellness
260 Terence Matthews Crescent
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K2M 2B2
(613) 831-1105
Business Address: 25 Front Ave W : 613-341-2423
Business Address: 110-1390 Prince of Wales Dr

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: St. John's Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
Outpatient Programme
25 Front Ave W Brockville, ON
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: 613-345-0640
Address: 243 Perth St
Brockville ON K6V 5E7
Phone: 613-341-2457
Extension: 5362
Fax: 613-342-2435
Address: 5-2200 Dundas St E
TELEMEDMD
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: +1 888-350-2323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMAP Health
Suite 110
1390 Prince of Wales Drive
Ottawa ON K2C 3N6
Phone: 1-888-691-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Nova Scotia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.S. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rao (CPSO#: 106121 )
Business Address: Health and Counselling Services
1125 University Drive #2600
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5B6
(613) 520-6674
Business Address: Terrace Wellness
260 Terence Matthews Crescent
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K2M 2B2
(613) 831-1105
Business Address: 25 Front Ave W : 613-341-2423
Business Address: 110-1390 Prince of Wales Dr

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASA SANJAY KUMAR RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASA SANJAY KUMAR RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. John's Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015