THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 42562
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOPEE-RAMANAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gopee-Ramanan (CPSO#: 106124 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 42562
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOPEE-RAMANAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gopee-Ramanan (CPSO#: 106124 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASAANTHAN GOPEE-RAMANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPEE-RAMANAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASAANTHAN GOPEE-RAMANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPEE-RAMANAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015