THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:53:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soniya Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 106126 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soniya Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 106126 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIYA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIYA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015