THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:18:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DANIEL SZOKE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Szoke (CPSO#: 106147 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
London Ontario N6A 5A5
5196858500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DANIEL SZOKE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Szoke (CPSO#: 106147 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
London Ontario N6A 5A5
5196858500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL JONATHAN SZOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZOKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL JONATHAN SZOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZOKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015