THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial Street
Toronto Ontario M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-487-2442.
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial Street
Toronto Ontario M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-487-2442.
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSEPH OZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSEPH OZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015